NJ A209 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3451
Note: Carry Foward to future S2385
Note: Carry Over of previous A1506
Note: Carry Foward to future S2385
Note: Carry Over of previous A1506
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes certain increases in school security expenditures from the tax levy cap applicable to school districts.
Title
Excludes certain increases in school security expenditures from the tax levy cap applicable to school districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] | Rep. Marlene Caride [D] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-09-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-16-6) |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A209 (Carry Over) 2016-09-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A209 (Carry Over) 2016-09-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1506 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A209 (Carry Over) 2016-09-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1506 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A209 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A0500/209_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A209 |