NJ A2109 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A6019
Note: Carry Over of previous S4133
Note: Carry Over of previous S4133
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DOH to establish policies to reduce number of cats and dogs euthanized at shelters and pounds.
Title
Directs DOH to establish policies to reduce number of cats and dogs euthanized at shelters and pounds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6019 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S946 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S4133 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S946 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S4133 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2109 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2109_I1.HTM |