NJ A214 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2599
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies authority of municipal court to suspend driver's licenses; establishes that the terms revoke and suspend are to have the same meaning under Title 39 of the Revised Statutes.*
Title
Clarifies authority of municipal court to suspend driver's licenses; establishes that the terms revoke and suspend are to have the same meaning under Title 39 of the Revised Statutes.*
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Grace Spencer [D] | Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A214 (Carry Over) 2014-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1774 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1774 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee