NJ A2172 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4397
Note: Carry Over of previous S2986
Note: Carry Over of previous S2986
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes electronic sports event as sports wagering; authorizes electronic sports wagering at certain locations.
Title
Includes electronic sports event as sports wagering; authorizes electronic sports wagering at certain locations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4397 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
S2986 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2417 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2986 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2417 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2172 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A2500/2172_I1.HTM |