NJ A2179 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1236
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of adulterated candy in New Jersey.
Title
Prohibits the sale of adulterated candy in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2179 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2799 (Same As) 2019-09-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2799 (Same As) 2019-09-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee