NJ A2179 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4816
Note: Carry Over of previous S2344
Note: Carry Over of previous S2344
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates five percent down payment requirement for bond ordinances approved by counties and municipalities.
Title
Eliminates five percent down payment requirement for bond ordinances approved by counties and municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4816 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2344 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3119 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2344 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3119 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2179 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A2500/2179_I1.HTM |