NJ A2182 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2357
Note: Carry Foward to future S2538
Note: Carry Over of previous A2592
Note: Carry Over of previous S68
Note: Carry Foward to future S2538
Note: Carry Over of previous A2592
Note: Carry Over of previous S68
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires applicants for commercial driver license to complete training course on handling and responding to suspected human trafficking.
Title
Requires applicants for commercial driver license to complete training course on handling and responding to suspected human trafficking.
Sponsors
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2182 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A2182 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A2592 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1421 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S68 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2182 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A2592 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1421 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S68 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2182 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2182_I1.HTM |