NJ A2195 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2363
Note: Carry Foward to future S1184
Note: Carry Over of previous A3634
Note: Carry Foward to future S1184
Note: Carry Over of previous A3634
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires one member of board in charge of institution for persons with mental illness or developmental disability to be family member of resident.
Title
Requires one member of board in charge of institution for persons with mental illness or developmental disability to be family member of resident.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2195 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2195 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3634 (Carry Over) 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S343 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2195 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3634 (Carry Over) 2016-11-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S343 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee