NJ A2206 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A418
Note: Carry Over of previous A4267
Note: Carry Over of previous S1683
Note: Carry Over of previous A4267
Note: Carry Over of previous S1683
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns regulation of solid waste, hazardous waste, and soil and fill recycling industries.
Title
Concerns regulation of solid waste, hazardous waste, and soil and fill recycling industries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2206 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
A4267 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S1683 (3R)
S1683 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.397.
A4267 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S1683 (3R)
S1683 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.397.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2206 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2206_I1.HTM |