NJ A2226 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A4409
Note: Carry Foward to future S2960
Note: Carry Over of previous A1677
Note: Carry Over of previous S2347
Note: Carry Foward to future S2960
Note: Carry Over of previous A1677
Note: Carry Over of previous S2347
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends fines for certain first-time paperwork violations committed by small businesses.
Title
Suspends fines for certain first-time paperwork violations committed by small businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2226 (Carry Over) 2020-10-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2226 (Carry Over) 2020-10-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1677 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2347 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2226 (Carry Over) 2020-10-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1677 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2347 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee