NJ A224 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A101
Note: Carry Over of previous S1268
Note: Carry Over of previous S1268
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows corporation business tax and gross income tax credits to businesses paying a salary differential to National Guard members or reservists on active duty.
Title
Allows corporation business tax and gross income tax credits to businesses paying a salary differential to National Guard members or reservists on active duty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A101 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1902 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1268 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1902 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1268 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A224 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/224_I1.HTM |