NJ A2290 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1563
Note: Carry Foward to future S2446
Note: Carry Over of previous S1969
Note: Carry Foward to future S2446
Note: Carry Over of previous S1969
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "Neighborhood Scholar Revitalization Pilot Program."
Title
Establishes the "Neighborhood Scholar Revitalization Pilot Program."
Sponsors
Rep. William Moen [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2290 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2290 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1969 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1332 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2290 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1969 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1332 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee