NJ A2338 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1454
Note: Carry Foward to future S2658
Note: Legislation replaced by S3041
Note: Carry Foward to future S2658
Note: Legislation replaced by S3041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S3041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S3041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises "Pet Purchase Protection Act" to establish new requirements for pet dealers and pet shops. *
Title
Revises "Pet Purchase Protection Act" to establish new requirements for pet dealers and pet shops. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S3041 |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2338 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S3041
A2338 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S3041
S63 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S3041 (Replaced by) 2017-05-01 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A2338 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S3041
S63 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S3041 (Replaced by) 2017-05-01 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate