NJ A2360 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1111
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.441.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.441.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric public utility to charge residential rate for service used by residential customer for electric vehicle charging at charging stations within certain designated parking spaces.
Title
Requires electric public utility to charge residential rate for service used by residential customer for electric vehicle charging at charging stations within certain designated parking spaces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3285 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3285 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.441. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-3-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S3285 (1R) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Greenstein) |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-4-0) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2360 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.441.
S3285 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A2360
S3285 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A2360