NJ A2373 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4480
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Substituted by S995 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Substituted by S995 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts new "Uniform Interstate Family Support Act"; repeals previous uniform law.
Title
Enacts new "Uniform Interstate Family Support Act"; repeals previous uniform law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Substituted by S995 (1R) |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S995 (Same As) 2016-03-23 - Approved P.L.2016, c.1.
A4480 (Carry Over) 2015-06-04 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4480 (Carry Over) 2015-06-04 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading