NJ A2374 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1216
Note: Carry Foward to future S1573
Note: Carry Over of previous A2895
Note: Carry Foward to future S1573
Note: Carry Over of previous A2895
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-6-10)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-6-10)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Attorney General to establish Statewide gun buyback program.
Title
Requires Attorney General to establish Statewide gun buyback program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1154 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-6-10) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-7) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S1154 (2R) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (52-17-5) |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2374 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-6-10)
A2374 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-6-10)
A2895 (Carry Over) 2015-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1154 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A2374 (2R)
A2374 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-6-10)
A2895 (Carry Over) 2015-12-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1154 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A2374 (2R)