NJ A2390 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Substituted by S1456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Substituted by S1456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination against potential organ transplant recipient on basis of mental or physical disability.
Title
Prohibits discrimination against potential organ transplant recipient on basis of mental or physical disability.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S1456 |
2012-09-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-02-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1456 (Same As) 2013-07-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.80.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A2390 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A2500/2390_I1.HTM |