NJ A2404 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2911
Note: Carry Foward to future S2289
Note: Carry Over of previous A2506
Note: Carry Foward to future S2289
Note: Carry Over of previous A2506
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, after study, DEP to adopt total maximum daily loads for Barnegat Bay ecosystem, and requires DEP to adopt nutrient standards for NJ marine waters.
Title
Requires, after study, DEP to adopt total maximum daily loads for Barnegat Bay ecosystem, and requires DEP to adopt nutrient standards for NJ marine waters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-0-6) |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2404 (Carry Over) 2016-04-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2404 (Carry Over) 2016-04-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2506 (Carry Over) 2014-02-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S765 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2404 (Carry Over) 2016-04-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2506 (Carry Over) 2014-02-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S765 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee