NJ A2444 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1843
Note: Carry Foward to future A2872
Note: Carry Over of previous S1190
Note: Carry Over of previous A4849
Note: Carry Foward to future A2872
Note: Carry Over of previous S1190
Note: Carry Over of previous A4849
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Quinn Wilson's Law; provides a gross income tax credit for birth resulting in stillbirth.
Title
Quinn Wilson's Law; provides a gross income tax credit for birth resulting in stillbirth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2444 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A2444 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S513 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1190 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4849 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A2444 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S513 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1190 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4849 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2444 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2444_I1.HTM |