NJ A248 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-02 - Approved P.L.2013, c.173.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-02 - Approved P.L.2013, c.173.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Education to change deadline for municipal review of defeated school budgets whenever he changes the annual school election date.
Title
Requires Commissioner of Education to change deadline for municipal review of defeated school budgets whenever he changes the annual school election date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] |
Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2458 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2458 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-02 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.173. |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Substituted for S2458 |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2012-11-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2458 (Same As) 2013-11-18 - Substituted by A248