NJ A2504 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1937
Note: Carry Foward to future A3606
Note: Carry Over of previous A3158
Note: Carry Over of previous S508
Note: Carry Foward to future A3606
Note: Carry Over of previous A3158
Note: Carry Over of previous S508
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public and nonpublic secondary schools to annually conduct written or verbal substance use screening on all students using a particular screening program.
Title
Requires public and nonpublic secondary schools to annually conduct written or verbal substance use screening on all students using a particular screening program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2504 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2504 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S298 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3158 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S508 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2504 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S298 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3158 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S508 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2504 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3000/2504_I1.HTM |