NJ A2529 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S990
Note: Carry Foward to future A3465
Note: Carry Over of previous A2618
Note: Carry Over of previous S1522
Note: Carry Foward to future A3465
Note: Carry Over of previous A2618
Note: Carry Over of previous S1522
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The New Jersey Battlefield to Boardroom Act; provides corporation business tax credits and gross income tax credits for qualified wages of certain veterans.
Title
The New Jersey Battlefield to Boardroom Act; provides corporation business tax credits and gross income tax credits for qualified wages of certain veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2529 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2529 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2618 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S282 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1522 (Carry Over) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2529 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2618 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S282 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1522 (Carry Over) 2020-07-30 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2529 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3000/2529_I1.HTM |