NJ A2536 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2508
Note: Carry Over of previous A2692
Note: Carry Over of previous A2692
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Department of the Treasury to collect for overpayment of UI benefits.
Title
Requires Department of the Treasury to collect for overpayment of UI benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (65-4-4) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2536 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A2692 (Carry Over) 2015-06-04 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2692 (Carry Over) 2015-06-04 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading