NJ A2572 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Substituted by S1794 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Substituted by S1794 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows municipalities adjacent to two or more municipalities having urban enterprise zones to qualify for NJ Redevelopment Authority financing assistance. *
Title
Allows municipalities adjacent to two or more municipalities having urban enterprise zones to qualify for NJ Redevelopment Authority financing assistance. *
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Alberto Coutinho [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Rep. Angel Fuentes [D] |
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Ruben Ramos [D] | Rep. Caridad Rodriguez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Substituted by S1794 (1R) | |
2010-06-10 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1794 (Same As) 2010-08-23 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A2572 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3000/2572_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3000/2572_R1.HTM |