NJ A2597 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.274.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.274.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that beginning with the 2016-2017 grade nine class, Advanced Placement computer science course may satisfy a part of the mathematics credits required for high school graduation.*
Title
Provides that beginning with the 2016-2017 grade nine class, Advanced Placement computer science course may satisfy a part of the mathematics credits required for high school graduation.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2161 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2161 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.274. |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-1) |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Substituted for S2161 (1R) |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2161 (Same As) 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A2597 (2R)