NJ A2649 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-24 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-24 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public contractors to report certain employment information.
Title
Requires public contractors to report certain employment information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 45 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1932 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1932 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-24 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2012-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-31-0) |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-14) |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S1932 (1R) |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2012-03-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (46-31-0) |
2012-03-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-03-12 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Labor Committee |
2012-03-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-03-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1932 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - Substituted by A2649 (2R)