NJ A2671 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for voluntary contributions by taxpayers on gross income tax returns for maintenance of certain State memorials honoring war veterans.
Title
Provides for voluntary contributions by taxpayers on gross income tax returns for maintenance of certain State memorials honoring war veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. John Wisniewski [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] |
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Alison McHose [R] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2012-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-03-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1097 (Same As) 2013-06-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading