NJ A2725 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Substituted by S846/504 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Substituted by S846/504 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances penalty for leaving the scene of boating accident.
Title
Enhances penalty for leaving the scene of boating accident.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Substituted by S846/504 (SCS) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S846 (Same As) 2014-07-03 - Approved P.L.2014, c.17.