NJ A2763 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1888
Note: Carry Foward to future A3690
Note: Carry Over of previous S1218
Note: Carry Over of previous A1521
Note: Carry Foward to future A3690
Note: Carry Over of previous S1218
Note: Carry Over of previous A1521
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"New Voter Empowerment Act"; permits 17 year olds to vote in primary election if they turn 18 years old before next succeeding general election.
Title
"New Voter Empowerment Act"; permits 17 year olds to vote in primary election if they turn 18 years old before next succeeding general election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2763 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2763 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S587 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1218 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1521 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A2763 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S587 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1218 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1521 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading