NJ A2846 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2952
Note: Carry Foward to future S919
Note: Carry Over of previous A3821
Note: Carry Over of previous S2645
Note: Carry Foward to future S919
Note: Carry Over of previous A3821
Note: Carry Over of previous S2645
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Transit ADA Task Force."
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Transit ADA Task Force."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2846 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A2846 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1203 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A3821 (Carry Over) 2020-12-10 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2645 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2846 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1203 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A3821 (Carry Over) 2020-12-10 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2645 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2846 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3000/2846_I1.HTM |