NJ A2873 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-28 - Substituted by S2036 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-28 - Substituted by S2036 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The "Offshore Wind Economic Development Act"; establishes offshore wind renewable energy certificate program, and authorizes EDA to provide tax credits for qualified wind energy facilities in wind energy zones.
Title
The "Offshore Wind Economic Development Act"; establishes offshore wind renewable energy certificate program, and authorizes EDA to provide tax credits for qualified wind energy facilities in wind energy zones.
Sponsors
Rep. John Amodeo [R] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Concetta Wagner [D] | Rep. John Wisniewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Substituted by S2036 (2R) | |
2010-06-24 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee | |
2010-06-14 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2036 (Same As) 2010-08-19 - Approved P.L.2010, c.57.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A2873 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3000/2873_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3000/2873_R1.HTM |