NJ A2888 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2786
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-16 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-16 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires teacher preparation program for instuctional certificate to include certain amount of instruction or clinical experience in special education and for students with disabilities endorsement to include credit hours in autism spectrum disorder.**
Title
Requires teacher preparation program for instuctional certificate to include certain amount of instruction or clinical experience in special education and for students with disabilities endorsement to include credit hours in autism spectrum disorder.**
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. David Rible [R] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2888 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1039 (Same As) 2015-11-16 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1039 (Same As) 2015-11-16 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading