NJ A2914 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows State residents who are outside of New Jersey to place wagers on horse races using account wagering system.
Title
Allows State residents who are outside of New Jersey to place wagers on horse races using account wagering system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2012-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |