NJ A2915 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.276.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.276.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Uniform Trust Code."
Title
"Uniform Trust Code."
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Jack Ciattarelli [R] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Sen. Peter Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2035 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2035 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.276. |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Substituted for S2035 (1R) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0) |
2014-09-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2035 (Same As) 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A2915 (2R)