NJ A2973 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-13 - Substituted by S1955
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-13 - Substituted by S1955
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates dock fees and establishes penalty for boat permit violations on Greenwood Lake.
Title
Eliminates dock fees and establishes penalty for boat permit violations on Greenwood Lake.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-13 | Substituted by S1955 | |
2010-10-14 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1955 (Same As) 2011-01-28 - Approved P.L.2011, c.8.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A2973 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3000/2973_I1.HTM |