NJ A2996 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1332
Note: Carry Over of previous A2196
Note: Carry Over of previous S2117
Note: Carry Over of previous A2196
Note: Carry Over of previous S2117
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Pending: Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Pending: Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain licensee filing requirements for alcoholic beverage price lists; removes requirement that limited brewery and distillery licensees provide tour when selling certain alcoholic beverages to consumers.
Title
Revises certain licensee filing requirements for alcoholic beverage price lists; removes requirement that limited brewery and distillery licensees provide tour when selling certain alcoholic beverages to consumers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2996 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
A2196 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2067 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2117 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2196 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2067 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2117 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2996 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3000/2996_I1.HTM |