NJ A3008 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3242
Note: Carry Over of previous A1829
Note: Carry Over of previous S1633
Note: Carry Over of previous A1829
Note: Carry Over of previous S1633
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Lactation Consultants Licensing Act."
Title
"Lactation Consultants Licensing Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3008 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A1829 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2152 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1633 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1829 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2152 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1633 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3008 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3008_I1.HTM |