NJ A3043 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3525
Note: Carry Foward to future S1317
Note: Carry Over of previous S3562
Note: Carry Foward to future S1317
Note: Carry Over of previous S3562
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires consumer reporting agencies to increase protection of consumers' personal information.
Title
Requires consumer reporting agencies to increase protection of consumers' personal information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3043 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3043 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1850 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3562 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3043 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1850 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3562 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee