NJ A3048 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Substituted by S1912 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Substituted by S1912 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Scholastic Student-Athlete Safety Act;" establishes measures to ensure health of student-athletes.
Title
"Scholastic Student-Athlete Safety Act;" establishes measures to ensure health of student-athletes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Assembly | Substituted by S1912 (2R) |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1912 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Approved P.L.2013, c.71.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A3048 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3500/3048_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3500/3048_R1.HTM |