NJ A3088 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4598
Note: Carry Over of previous S155
Note: Carry Over of previous S155
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires prosecutors to determine risk of re-offense under Megan's Law prior to offender's release from incarceration.
Title
Requires prosecutors to determine risk of re-offense under Megan's Law prior to offender's release from incarceration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4598 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S155 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2777 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S155 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2777 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3088 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3500/3088_I1.HTM |