NJ A3093 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Substituted by S988
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Substituted by S988
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits BPU to approve qualified wind energy project; requires BPU to provide application periods for those projects.
Title
Permits BPU to approve qualified wind energy project; requires BPU to provide application periods for those projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Substituted by S988 |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S988 (Same As) 2016-05-02 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A4128 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S2711 (1R)
A4128 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S2711 (1R)