NJ A3100 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S998
Note: Carry Foward to future A4506
Note: Carry Over of previous S4182
Note: Carry Foward to future A4506
Note: Carry Over of previous S4182
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for establishment of New Jersey Water Infrastructure Center at institute of higher education designated by DEP; appropriates $5 million.
Title
Provides for establishment of New Jersey Water Infrastructure Center at institute of higher education designated by DEP; appropriates $5 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3100 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A3100 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S294 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4182 (Carry Over) 2021-11-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3100 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S294 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4182 (Carry Over) 2021-11-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee