NJ A3109 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1754
Note: Carry Foward to future S1665
Note: Carry Foward to future S2253
Note: Carry Over of previous S806
Note: Carry Over of previous A2938
Note: Carry Foward to future S1665
Note: Carry Foward to future S2253
Note: Carry Over of previous S806
Note: Carry Over of previous A2938
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes confidentiality of landlord-tenant court records; addresses adverse actions on rental applications.
Title
Establishes confidentiality of landlord-tenant court records; addresses adverse actions on rental applications.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3109 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3109 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3109 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S539 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S806 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2938 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A3109 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3109 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S539 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S806 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2938 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3109 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3109_I1.HTM |