NJ A3169 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Substituted by S418 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Substituted by S418 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sale of certain laser pointers that exceed certain power output.
Title
Prohibits sale of certain laser pointers that exceed certain power output.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S418 (2R) |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Albano) |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S418 (Same As) 2013-10-17 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A3169 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3500/3169_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3500/3169_R1.HTM |