NJ A3184 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S385
Note: Carry Over of previous S3606
Note: Carry Over of previous A5802
Note: Carry Over of previous S3606
Note: Carry Over of previous A5802
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires informed consent for breast implant surgery.
Title
Requires informed consent for breast implant surgery.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3184 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S3606 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5802 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S812 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3606 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5802 (Carry Over) 2021-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S812 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A3184 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3500/3184_I1.HTM |