NJ A3192 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2641
Note: Carry Over of previous A2846
Note: Carry Over of previous S3189
Note: Carry Over of previous A2846
Note: Carry Over of previous S3189
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands registration requirements under Megan's Law to include persons committing human trafficking crimes or engaging in prostitution, when crimes involve minors.
Title
Expands registration requirements under Megan's Law to include persons committing human trafficking crimes or engaging in prostitution, when crimes involve minors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3192 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S270 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2846 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S3189 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S270 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2846 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S3189 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3192 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3192_I1.HTM |