NJ A3205 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-13)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Approved P.L.2012, c.13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-13)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - Approved P.L.2012, c.13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises "New Jersey Transportation Trust Fund Authority Act."
Title
Revises "New Jersey Transportation Trust Fund Authority Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2020 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2020 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-29 | Senate | Approved P.L.2012, c.13. |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-3) |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Substituted for S2020 (1R) |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-7-1) |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2020 (Same As) 2012-06-28 - Substituted by A3205