NJ A3242 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S335
Note: Carry Over of previous A4160
Note: Carry Over of previous A4160
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain deer control activities; establishes check-off donation on hunting license applications to support venison donation program; authorizes issuance of multi-species depredation permit for wildlife control on farmland.*
Title
Permits certain deer control activities; establishes check-off donation on hunting license applications to support venison donation program; authorizes issuance of multi-species depredation permit for wildlife control on farmland.*
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Rep. R. Bruce Land [D] | Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2419 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (26-8) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Substituted for S2419 (2R) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Smith) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-8-1) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3242 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A4160 (Carry Over) 2016-10-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2419 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Substituted by A3242 (2R)
A4160 (Carry Over) 2016-10-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2419 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Substituted by A3242 (2R)