NJ A3284 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A463
Note: Carry Over of previous A5248
Note: Carry Over of previous S3383
Note: Carry Over of previous A5248
Note: Carry Over of previous S3383
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing Advisory Committee on Family Services and Communications in Division of Developmental Disabilities in DHS.
Title
Establishing Advisory Committee on Family Services and Communications in Division of Developmental Disabilities in DHS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3284 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A5248 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3383 (Carry Over) 2021-01-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3284 (Same As) 2022-10-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5248 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3383 (Carry Over) 2021-01-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3284 (Same As) 2022-10-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A3284 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3500/3284_I1.HTM |