NJ A3303 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2414
Note: Carry Over of previous S1512
Note: Carry Over of previous S1512
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notice of cancellation or nonrenewal of automobile and homeowners insurance policies to be sent by certified mail, return receipt requested.
Title
Requires notice of cancellation or nonrenewal of automobile and homeowners insurance policies to be sent by certified mail, return receipt requested.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2414 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1512 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2894 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1512 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2894 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3303 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3500/3303_I1.HTM |